Accounts and annual returns PEN-Y-FFORDD AND FYNNONGROYW CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1193401
Charity reporting is up to date (272 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 March 2025 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 29 March 2025 272 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 September 2024 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 September 2024 432 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window