LOUIS THOROLD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1194891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES OF ROAD SAFETY WITH THE OBJECT OF REDUCING AND COPING WITH PERSONAL INJURY AND DEATH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF CHILDREN AND INFANTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,852
Total expenditure: £1,222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher James Thorold Chair 22 June 2021
None on record
Sioned Griffiths Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Gaynel Hamilton Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Darryl Matthews Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.90k £23.58k £3.85k
Total expenditure £1.42k £7.23k £1.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Portholme Place
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE29 3EQ
Phone:
07888701964