NETHER WHITACRE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We maintain a well kept village hall providing facilities for local and non local residents. Activities include facilities for badminton, weekly circuit training, weekly special needs playgroup, Ring Craft. Large hall available for larger groups, meeting room for parish council's & other meetings. Family and club celebrations/parties, dog shows, quizzes, bands. Large car park
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 12 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Hines | Chair | 01 January 1998 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jamieson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elliott | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jim Thompson | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Taylor | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Starkey | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Marie Ann Jamieson | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Kororo | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Walker | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LOUIS GODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH RICHARD WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.98k | £14.22k | £26.16k | £16.94k | £14.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.42k | £20.67k | £7.31k | £13.56k | £14.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NETHER WHITACRE IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nether Whitacre Village Hall
Station Road
Whitacre Heath
Coleshill
BIRMINGHAM
B46 2JB
- Phone:
- 07983335196
- Email:
- NWVHChair1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window