WOODWALTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Woodwalton Village Hall is a small hall located in the Cambridgeshire countryside with the nearest main town of Huntingdon located approx 8 miles away. The hall is operated by Trustees and is available for hire to everyone, subject to terms and conditions of a hire agreement. The Trustees aim is to bring a variety of interests into the village to enrich ours and the surrounding communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 March 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Anne Taylor | Chair | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Roberts | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ellis | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn West | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.45k | £939 | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £5.97k | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18 JUL 1948 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2021 as amended on 01 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUST PREMISES SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WOODWALTON IN THE COUNTY OF HUNTINGDON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THESE PRESENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodwalton Village Hall
Raveley Road
Woodwalton
Huntingdon
Cambridgeshire
PE28 5YN
- Phone:
- 07795284948
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window