ONE WORLD, ONE PEOPLE

Charity Number: 1195324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit, to provide relief and assistance of people who are the victims poverty and are suffering from hunger or eye disease in any part of the world by supplying them with food relief and eye treatment to prevent blindness.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £733
Total expenditure: £933

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Bangladesh
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Nepal
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • OUR WORLD, OUR PEOPLE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Shahina Pardhan Chair 03 February 2021
VISIONARY - LINKING LOCAL SIGHT LOSS CHARITIES
Received: On time
Dr RAJU SAPKOTA Trustee 03 February 2021
None on record
John Kidd MCOptom Trustee 03 February 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.97k £733
Total expenditure £1.22k £933
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 24 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
45 BROOKFIELD WAY
LOWER CAMBOURNE
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 5EB
Phone:
07768946456
Website:

No information available