MOBIUS DANCE GROUP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mobius Dance is an award-winning professional dance company based in Leeds and Bradford creating professionally led, and artistically excellent, dance opportunities for audiences and communities of all ages, backgrounds and abilities to engage with is at the core of our activity. The mission is to produce work and dance opportunities that inspire the public to participate; making dance inclusive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £56,960 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 March 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Kapadocha | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Mary Ruth Pollen | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Murrell | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Hannah Louise Bixby | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Recchia | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.46k | £17.11k | £86.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.14k | £11.93k | £75.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £56.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 APR 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ART OF DANCE, AND BY ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Dimsdale Drive
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN1 1HE
- Phone:
- 07986699306
- Email:
- mobiusdance@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window