COURT FARM EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Court Farm Evangelical Church is an independent evangelical pentecostal church in Mottingham, S.E. London. It was founded in 1938 and newly registered as a CIO on 31st October 2022. The main objectives of the church are to advance the Christian faith in accordance with our Statement of Belief, in Mottingham, south east London and other such parts of the United Kingdom or the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 12 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Christopher | Chair | 01 January 1985 |
|
|
||||
Christina Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Joseph Mashi | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.68k | £48.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.54k | £55.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN MOTTINGHAM, SOUTH EAST LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 Court Farm Road
London
SE9 4JS
- Phone:
- 02082490154
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window