CHARLIE.DALLAS.LANCASTER.FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1195207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a charitable foundation, fundraising to allow the provision of much needed help and support to individuals and organisations working within the mental health and suicide prevention sphere.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £68,812
Total expenditure: £44,379

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Jane Taylor Chair 19 July 2021
None on record
Alexandra Louise Rose Lancaster Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £95.11k £68.81k
Total expenditure £55.88k £44.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GARDENERS COTTAGE
NORTH KILVINGTON
THIRSK
YO7 2NS
Phone:
0783567658
Email:
info@cdlf.uk