TOUCHPOINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Touchpoint operates a community hub, well-being initiative, and free foodshare project. Based in Stansted Mountfitchet, Essex, we serve local towns and villages in Uttlesford, Essex and Hertfordshire. Working with specialist partners we facilitate and deliver an array of services addressing issues around mental health, social isolation, physical well-being and financial stress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £86,997 from 8 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD PETER JONES | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Fiona Louise Venus | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Elizabeth Johnson | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elissa Faye Burgoine | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Livingstone-Chambers | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.61k | £81.13k | £215.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.96k | £70.07k | £201.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.59k | £40.51k | £87.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Apr 2021 as amended on 03 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
The provision of community facilities, primarily in Uttlesford, Essex and Hertfordshire, in the interests of improving the wellbeing of persons who by reason of age, poverty or social and economic circumstances will benefit from them, specifically but not limited to: The prevention and relief of poverty and the preservation and promotion of good health, nutrition and social inclusion in such ways as the trustees may at their discretion think fit, including: 1) the collection and redistribution of surplus food; 2) the provision of support related to preparedness for the entry or return to the workplace; and 3) the encouragement and organisation of members of the public to undertake voluntary charitable work. To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment through the reduction of waste (in particular food waste) and increasing knowledge and understanding of its adverse environmental impacts.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TouchPoint
Crafton Green House
72 Chapel Hill
STANSTED
Essex
CM24 8AQ
- Phone:
- 07572114882
- Email:
- admin@thetouchpoint.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window