THE SISTERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sisters Club provides boxing and fitness training to women in England and USA, free of charge. Gym spaces are rented to ensure a safe and comfortable environment for members. Advance the physical fitness education of women in England and the USA by providing practical and financial support to enable them to work towards obtaining recognised personal training qualifications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 15 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Anthony Moore | Chair | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ramla Ali | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
SYED MOHAMMED FAIZAN SARWAR | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.49k | £117.28k | £180.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.60k | £74.26k | £141.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN ENGLAND AND THE USA FOR BOXING AND ASSOCIATED PHYSICAL TRAINING ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF WOMEN WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IN ENGLAND AND THE USA BY PROVIDING PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO WORK TOWARDS OBTAINING RECOGNISED QUALIFICATIONS IN PERSONAL TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
287 Leigham Court Road
LONDON
SW16 2RZ
- Phone:
- 07895788134
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window