HOPS (HARROGATE OPERATIC PLAYERS) MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in the dramatic and operatic arts, to further the development of public appreciation and taste in the said arts to assist and further such charitable institutions and charitable purposes as the committee shall from time to time determine. HOPS usually produces and performs one theatre show per year and operates primarily in the Harrogate District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 May 2021: CIO registration
- 21 October 2021: Funds received from 504462 HOPS (HARROGATE OPERATIC PLAYERS) MUSICAL THEATRE ...
- HOPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca White | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Jane Gladwyn | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rutherford | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Hartley | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lill | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE HELLAS | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Graham | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.86k | £84.50k | £85.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.23k | £76.19k | £71.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrogate Business Centre
Hammerain House
Hookstone Avenue
Harrogate
HG2 8ER
- Phone:
- 07767351270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window