SOCIAL ANXIETY ALLIANCE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Social Anxiety Alliance UK works for a society where Social Anxiety is better understood and diagnosed quickly, where appropriate treatment options are open and accessible, where support and information is readily available and where nobody feels ashamed to ask for help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Greening | Chair | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maham Yawar | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tatiana Allan | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Findlay | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liz Critchlow | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Whitbread | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Peacey | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £744 | £935 | |
|
Total expenditure | £511 | £583 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AMONG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SOCIAL ANXIETY DISORDER, SOCIAL PHOBIA AND RELATED DISORDERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) PROVIDING INFORMATION TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SOCIAL ANXIETY AND RELATED DISORDERS. (2) ADVANCING EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ABOUT SOCIAL ANXIETY AND RELATED DISORDERS AND ADVANCING EDUCATION AMONG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SOCIAL ANXIETY AND RELATED DISORDERS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO FAMILY MEMBERS, CARERS, TEACHERS, HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND SOCIAL WORKERS, TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF SOCIAL ANXIETY AND RELATED DISORDERS AND AVAILABLE TREATMENTS. (3) PROMOTING AND IMPROVING ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE AND EFFECTIVE TREATMENT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SOCIAL ANXIETY AND RELATED DISORDERS. (4) DISSEMINATING INFORMATION AND PROVIDING LINKS TO RESEARCH ON SOCIAL ANXIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
85 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 03003020079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window