STOKE ST MICHAEL WOODLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is responsible for the direct management of the area known as the Millennium Wood in Stoke St Michael. It aims to manage the wood safely as a site that enables wide access for the community, enabling health and wellbeing and enhanced education opportunities for the local school and other community interest groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Paul Clarke | Chair | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Johnston | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Mearns | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Taylor | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Keith Hambly | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
John McEntee | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.75k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE MILLENNIUM WOOD WITHIN THE PARISH OF STOKE ST. MICHAEL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Belmont Cottages
Stoke Hill
Stoke St. Michael
RADSTOCK
BA3 5JN
- Phone:
- 01749840251
- Email:
- sclarke197408@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window