BAY TRUST RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness, infirmity and the disabilities attendant amongst persons living in South Cumbria and North Lancashire by providing a local broadcasting service for hospitals, hospices, old persons homes and similar institutions and, wherever possible, providing a similar service within the local community to assist patients receiving care in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 30 March 2021: CIO registration
- 08 August 2023: Funds received from 506296 BAY TRUST RADIO
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Lambert | Chair | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Pardoe | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Woodcock | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.15k | £9.33k | £9.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | £6.54k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND THE DISABILITIES ATTENDANT AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN SOUTH CUMBRIA AND NORTH LANCASHIRE BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, HOSPICES, OLD PERSONS HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS AND, WHEREVER POSSIBLE, PROVIDING A SIMILAR SERVICE WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO ASSIST PATIENTS RECEIVING CARE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bay Trust Radio
WESTMORLAND GENERAL HOSPITAL
BURTON ROAD
KENDAL
LA9 7RG
- Phone:
- 03302230056
- Email:
- info@baytrustradio.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window