KING LEAR ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
King Lear Arts runs activities to encourage active participation in the arts, particularly focused on older people in the UK. Our flagship activity is the King Lear Prizes arts competition, which takes entries from amateurs across the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Browning | Chair | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Rudd-Jones | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anneliese Gilchrist | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry Bowen | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £66 | £41.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £1.38k | £39.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 May 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY OFFERING OR PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE CREATIVE ARTS. ‘ACTIVE PARTICIPATION’ MEANS PARTICIPANTS CREATING OR PERFORMING WORKS THEMSELVES, RATHER THAN VIEWING, LISTENING TO, OR OTHERWISE CONSUMING WORKS CREATED OR PERFORMED BY OTHERS. ‘CREATIVE ARTS’ MEANS ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: CRAFTS, DANCE, DESIGN, DIGITAL ARTS AND MEDIA, FILM, LITERATURE (INCLUDING CREATIVE WRITING AND POETRY), MUSIC, OPERA, PHOTOGRAPHY, THEATRE, THE VISUAL ARTS, AND CROSS-ARTS PRACTICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KING LEAR ARTS
OFFICE 704
19-21 CRAWFORD STREET
LONDON
W1H 1PJ
- Phone:
- 0
- Email:
- support@kinglearprizes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window