GOXHILL MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and running of a village hall to provide recreational and leisure time activities for the residents of Goxhill. Oversight of the use of a recreation ground by Goxhill's lawn bowling club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £96 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 February 2021: CIO registration
- 14 February 2022: Funds received from 521928 GOXHILL MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Carter | Chair | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jones | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Raby | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Firth | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Simons | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Shephardson | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Atkins | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Dane | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel England | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Hugh Noton | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.17k | £19.94k | £18.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.69k | £18.44k | £15.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.96k | £250 | £96 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 24 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED ON 26 OCT 2022 AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GOXHILL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE AND ADMINISTRATION OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND IN, AND FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF, THE PARISH OF GOXHILL (THE AREA OF BENEFIT).
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GOXHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOXHILL MEMORIAL HALL
Chapel Street
Goxhill
North Lincolnshire
DN19 7JJ
- Phone:
- 01469530635
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window