Accounts and annual returns EAST WOODLANDS VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1193691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 April 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 April 2024 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 February 2023 4 days late Download Open in new window