Trustees ARCADE ARTS LTD
Charity number: 1194711

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Clare Crowley | Chair | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Avison | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Katharine Victoria McMullen | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Paul Romer | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ysabelle Wombwell | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kelsie Acton | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stephenson | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.