STANDING TALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Standing Tall Foundation promote the mental and physical health of all community groups, through the provision of counselling, addiction support and physical activity initiatives. We further extend this support into the community to help those in financial hardship, including the homeless, via the provision of grants, items and services using the resources secured by the Foundation or those ma
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- St Helens
Governance
- 11 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Hart | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Rob Ditchfield | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Parry-Jones | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Nicholson | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sykes | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Alexander James Mussell | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Brighouse | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.68k | £196.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.83k | £210.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2022 as amended on 28 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) COUNSELLING, DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY SUPPORT AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY INITIATIVES. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG THE HOMELESS OR THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVISORY SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Standing Tall Foundation
The Living Well Building
Borough Rd
ST HELENS
Merseyside
WA10 3RN
- Phone:
- 07882540998
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window