HOPE FOR DEAF AFRICANS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting or protecting human rights of Deaf people in Africa Advancing education of Deaf people in Africa Advancing health and wellbeing of Deaf people in Africa Advancing social, socio economic and culture of Deaf people in Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Yankey | Chair | 26 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
MATTHEW ADEDEJI | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Olawale Alade | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Samba Coker | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.58k | £485 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 293 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DEAF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, TRAINING AND EQUIPMENT. 2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR THE EQUALITY AND INCLUSION OF DEAF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN AFRICA BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION EXPERIENCED ON THE GROUNDS OF DISABILITY OR DEAFNESS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 MAYGROVE ROAD
LONDON
NW6 2ED
- Phone:
- 07762234872
- Email:
- hopedeafafricans@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window