Every Future Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Every Future Foundation delivers educational workshops to young people throughout the UK, educating young people on anti-racism and racial equity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 July 2024
Total income includes £1,600 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 2021: CIO registration
- EVERY FUTURE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- BREAKFAST CLUBS AGAINST RACISM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Junejo | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Mosuro | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric John Feltin | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Natalia Agard | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Turner | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Michaella Tity Jengo | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/02/2022 | 15/07/2023 | 15/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.45k | £108.93k | £130.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.95k | £96.83k | £116.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 July 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 July 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jul 2021 as amended on 08 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF RACISM, RACIAL EQUALITY, HARMONY AND DIVERSITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL BREAKFAST CLUBS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, “BREAKFAST CLUB” MEANS A SERIES OF SATURDAY MORNING MEETINGS, PROVIDING FREE HEALTHY BREAKFASTS FOR ATTENDEES AND DELIVERING ANTI-RACISM EDUCATION. 2) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camden Collective
5-7 Buck Street
London
NW1 8NJ
- Phone:
- 07555720939
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window