ANIMALS OF OUR WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide shelter to animals rescued from abuse, abandonment, or neglect in Siem Reap, Cambodia. We provide support to local Cambodian families whose animals need emergency medical attention that they can't provide themselves. We provide animal rescues services, vaccination, and spay/neuter to the animals in our area who need it the most.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambodia
Governance
- 06 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Kaczorowski | Chair | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ricky-Jo Coster | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Falco | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.27k | £65.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.13k | £66.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2022 as amended on 14 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of all animals in Cambodia, and, in particular, to provide care and treatment for such animals.
Contact information
- Address:
-
243 NOAK HILL ROAD
BILLERICAY
CM12 9UN
- Phone:
- 07533927227
- Email:
- aoow@animalsofourworld.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window