JAMAICA SOCIETY (LEEDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational work shops advocacy provide venue for repass for funerals family & community events. Care group that supports members of the community who are unwell, visiting in hospitals and home settings. Joint northern regional networking events social events liaising with the Jamaican High Commission to provide legal guidance and support for members and the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Henry Ms | Chair | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Marie Eddison | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melody Walker | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Yvonne May English | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Condor | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hamlet Anthony Fothergill | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neville Winston Mcfarlane | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dorothy Stewart | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Irene Henry | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.69k | £64.66k | £105.32k | £349.25k | £118.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.06k | £94.00k | £92.21k | £343.84k | £179.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £150 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 15 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (AND PARTICULARLY THOSE PERSONS OF JAMAICAN ORIGIN) AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY AND INFIRM AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LEEDS AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
277 Chapeltown Road
Potternewton
Leeds
LS7 3HA
- Phone:
- 01132626435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window