WEALD GYMNASTICS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's Gymnastics Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £13,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 07 May 2021: CIO registration
- THE WEALD OF KENT GYMNASTICS CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Bradburne | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Leman | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Dart | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Parkes | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.31k | £343.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.82k | £306.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.82k | £13.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WEALD OF KENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ,IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF GYMNASTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6A Sovereign Way
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN9 1RS
- Phone:
- 01732350290
- Email:
- info@wealdgymnastics.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window