WALTHAM CHASE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A pre-school provision proving quality education for children ages 2-4years following the guidance from the Early Years Alliance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 March 2021: CIO registration
- 16 December 2022: Funds received from 1038627 WALTHAM CHASE PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA GLOVER | Chair | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Lazarou | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Atkins | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Finch | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUCY FRANCIS | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Munson | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Glover | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Wells | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cooper | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.44k | £87.20k | £111.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.01k | £88.34k | £100.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £600 | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE STATUTORY FRAMEWORK FOR THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE EARLY YEARS ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waltham Chase Village Hall
Winchester Road
Waltham Chase
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 2LX
- Phone:
- 07913640795
- Website:
-
walthamchasepreschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window