EASY STREET THEATRE COMPANY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 2009, Easy Street Theatre Company offers Sheffield's young creative talent the finest professional-grade theatrical training. With around 50 members, each year the company performs two large budget shows at some of Sheffield's most prestigious theatres. Previous shows include Cats, Jesus Christ Superstar, Footloose, West Side Story Sister Act and most recently Chicago.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Preston | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Smith | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Gowers | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Tagg | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tyas Mr | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Bradford | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.91k | £43.35k | £32.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.16k | £45.32k | £38.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2024
(These accounts |
25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE DRAMATIC AND PERFORMING ARTS, INCLUDING BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF A STRUCTURED PROGRAMME OF LEARNING IN THEATRE AND TECHNICAL SKILLS AND; 2. THE PROVISION OF EXPERIENTIAL LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LIVE PERFORMANCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASY STREET THEATRE COMPANY CIO
C/O Merlin Theatre
1 Meadow Bank Road
Sheffield
S11 9AH
- Phone:
- 07512774810
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window