CHESTERFIELD ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public in the local area to relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention and in particular to provide and maintain rescue homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals and to educate the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Philip Keeble | Chair | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
TINA ANN VARLEY | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clare Bradley | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/04/2022 | 19/04/2023 | 19/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.18k | £22.61k | £28.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.15k | £30.17k | £26.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 April 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 April 2022 | 12 June 2024 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2022 | 12 June 2024 | 479 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Loundes Road
Unstone
Dronfield
S18 4DE
- Phone:
- 07780337662
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window