ROYAL AIR FORCE MOUNTAINEERING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote military efficiency in such charitable ways as the trustees think fit particularly supporting and fostering physical and mental health, well-being and resilience, and raising morale. Providing training and development opportunities. Encouraging and enabling expeditions, the spirit of adventure, mountain craft, leadership and followership, and self-reliance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 2021: CIO registration
- RAF MOUNTAINEERING ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark James Hill MSc | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Air Commodore Emily J Flynn CBE | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Julian Eugene Kurth CBE FRGS | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Singleton MBE | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Claire Theodora Brewin MSc MA MBA | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.05k | £42.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.96k | £43.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY’S ARMED FORCES IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO: (1) SUPPORTING AND FOSTERING PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, WELL-BEING AND RESILIENCE, AND RAISING MORALE. (2) PROVIDING TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE CIO THAT FOSTER THE MILITARY ETHOS. (3) ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING EXPEDITIONS, AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITY, AS A VEHICLE FOR FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, THE SPIRIT OF ADVENTURE, MOUNTAIN CRAFT, LEADERSHIP AND FOLLOWERSHIP, AND SELF-RELIANCE. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, THE TRUSTEES MAY FURTHER THE OBJECTS THROUGH ENCOURAGING, ENABLING AND FACILITATING THE PARTICIPATION IN, AND PROVISION OF OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MOUNTAINEERING IN THE ROYAL AIR FORCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAF Mountaineering
Room 43
Kermode Hall
RAF Halton
AYLESBURY
Buckingh
- Phone:
- 01296796560
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window