WE'VE GOT YOUR BACK

Charity number: 1194393
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We've got your back has been formed with a vision to help homeless individuals and families within our community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2021: CIO registration
  • 15 July 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 15 July 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 February 2023 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 February 2023 109 days late