EASE: MUSLIM FUNERAL SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps those in financial need to bury their loved ones. we are UK based and generally focus in the North West/Greater Manchester. Muslim funerals are very specific, the body needs to be washed, shrouded and buried and cannot be cremated therefore if the family cannot afford this, they will come to use and we would pay to the funeral directors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jewel choudhury | Chair | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Juhel Miah | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Anwar Ali | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.00k | £23.98k | £41.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.31k | £20.79k | £44.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY TO ENABLE THEM TO OBSERVE ISLAMIC PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES RELATING TO THE BURIAL OF THE DECEASED WHERE THEY MAY OTHERWISE LACK THE FINANCIAL MEANS TO DO SO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 SOUTH HILL STREET
OLDHAM
LANCASHIRE
OL4 1DZ
- Phone:
- 07823486021
- Email:
- info@easemfs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window