STOCKPORT USER FRIENDLY FELLOWSHIP STUFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE MENTAL HEALTH AND ALCOHOL SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE IN THE STOCKPORT AREA WHO ARE SUFFERING AND RECOVERING FROM A RANGE OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS. WE OFFER A RANGE OF SOCIAL, THERAPEUTIC, LEISURE, VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES /ACTIVITIES THAT TAKE PLACE IN MENTAL HEALTH COMMUNITY SETTINGS AND THROUGHOUT THE WIDER COMMUNITY RECOGNISING INDIVIDUALITY AND SUPPORT PEOPLE ON THEIR RECOVERY JOURNEY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,698 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stockport
Governance
- 18 February 2021: CIO registration
- 25 May 2022: Funds received from 1177660 STOCKPORT USER FRIENDLY FELLOWSHIP
- STOCKPORT USER FRIENDLY FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Hickie | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miroslawa Ludzen | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI YATES | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARTLOMIEJ SPORYSZKIEWICZ | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANINA SPORYSZKIEWICZ | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.67k | £13.66k | £18.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.64k | £24.12k | £19.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.70k | £8.70k | £8.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS IN THE STOCKPORT METROPOLITAN BOROUGH, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF A GROUP PROVIDING SUCH PEOPLE WITH SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND A RANGE OF THERAPEUTIC AND SKILLS-BASED ACTIVITIES FOCUSED ON MENTAL HEALTH AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE/MAINTAIN CONTROL OF THEIR HEALTH AND REMAIN WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oasis Building
Mental Health Unit
Stepping Hill Hospital
Poplar Grove
Stockport
SK2 7JE
- Phone:
- 07845928227
- Email:
- info@stuffstockport.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window