Accounts and annual returns SPARK CHARITY

Charity number: 1195226
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2025 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2025 366 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window