COPELAND OCCUPATIONAL AND SOCIAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing confidence building activities for people with physical disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
Total income includes £51,908 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 10 June 1986: Standard registration
- C O S C (Working name)
- DISABLED WORK CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE GREARS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
susan baxter | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Trolley | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
TOM JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIM PULLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.76k | £277.03k | £339.17k | £293.07k | £319.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.52k | £254.05k | £301.60k | £250.55k | £346.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £125.40k | £141.67k | £167.12k | £123.39k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | £49.50k | £132.10k | £51.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 68 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 68 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 433 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 433 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 1989, 27 JUNE 1996 AND 26 JUNE 1997 AND 24 JUNE 1999 AND 14TH FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 65 INHABITANT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF COPELAND AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BUNKER
CLEATOR MOOR SQUARE
CLEATOR MOOR
CUMBRIA
CA25 5AP
- Phone:
- 01946815283
- Email:
- cosccm@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window