E G WILCOX CHARITIES

Charity number: 517657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

dONATION OF FUNDS TO SOLIHULL SCHOOL AND THE 1ST SOLIHULL SCOUTS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £55,584
Total expenditure: £51,929

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CLOVELLY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON GORDON WILCOX Chair
None on record
Dr RICHARD GORDON WILCOX Trustee
None on record
ADAM CORNEY Trustee
None on record
DAVID JOHN CORNEY Trustee
CHARITY OF THOMAS HARBORNE
Received: On time
THE W E DUNN TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHNSON MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE DAVENPORT HOMES
Received: On time
THE LAPWORTH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LAPWORTH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £64.24k £43.08k £50.36k £54.56k £55.58k
Total expenditure £46.14k £61.17k £40.23k £48.34k £51.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 2 APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME OR ANY PARTS THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL OR ANY OF THE PUPILS FOR THE TIME BEING IN THE SIXTH FORM OF SOLIHULL SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 July 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
POST HOUSE
BARSTON LANE
BARSTON
SOLIHULL
B92 0JU
Phone:
01675442708
Website:

No information available