BOCKLETON FIELD STUDY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and Training for children, young people and families from Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2013
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTS SUB COMMITTEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2009 | 03/04/2010 | 03/04/2011 | 03/04/2012 | 03/04/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 APRIL 1986 AND SCHEME DATED 1 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHALL BE: (A) PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT AND STUDY OF LAND KNOWN AS SWINGLEY POOL AND GARDEN SLING FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 TO 18 WHO ARE LIVING OR WORKING OR ATTENDING ANY SCHOOLS OR COOLLEGES WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM. (B) PROVIDE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (C) ASSIST WITH THE DEVELOPMENT OF OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clifton Road Youth Centre
Youth Headquarters
Clifton Road
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B73 6EB
- Phone:
- 01216756395
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window