FUNKYKIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
funky kids provides social and recreational activities to families effected by hearing loss preventing social isolation, improving health and well being and improving mental health. we hold large monthly themed events, we hold weekly support groups , coffee mornings and a parent and toddler group, we provide a monthly youth service and signing classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 08 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
robert carter | Chair | 28 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
wayne samuels | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte mills | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edonna thomas | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Adrian perks | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen marklew | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter marklew | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
gillian symonds | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher windsor | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.53k | £67.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.58k | £72.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG CHILDREN WHO ARE EFFECTED BY DEAFNESS OR HAVE HEARING IMPAIRMENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS, LIVING IN THE MIDLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING DEAF OR HAVING A HEARING IMPAIRMENTS BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND GROUP SUPPORT TO ENABLE THE SHARING OF INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Stephenson Avenue
WALSALL
WS2 7HD
- Phone:
- 07912880373
- Email:
- funkykidswalsall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window