SOUL SISTERS: EMPOWERING PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Soul Sisters: Empowering People is a charity founded to support victims and survivors of Domestic Abuse, and their families, to Live Without Fear. We empower people to move forward through advocacy, signposting, peer support, 1-2-1 support, mentoring and coaching both online and in person.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
- Rochdale
Governance
- 26 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Victoria Daisy Barker-Mills | Chair | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lilly james Bell | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Khyati Patel | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
LaToya Robinson | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosannah Jones | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gaby Marsden | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asma Begum Ali | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | 29/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03k | £15.20k | £25.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.34k | £9.40k | £21.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO, TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LANCASHIRE, IS: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND SUPPORT THOSE AT RISK OF, OR SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE/DOMESTIC ABUSE (TO INCLUDE SEXUAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND ECONOMIC ABUSE) AND THEIR CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ONE-TO-ONE SESSIONS, PEER SUPPORT, GROUP SESSIONS, MENTORING, ADVOCACY AND SIGNPOSTING SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUL SISTERS UNIT 37367
PO BOX 4336
MANCHESTER
M61 0BW
- Phone:
- 07309612325
- Email:
- Info@soulsisters.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window