Financial history HARMBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 517661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £6.30k £11.16k £2.00k £7.22k £7.34k
Total expenditure £7.55k £3.41k £4.38k £6.90k £14.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A