THE REBUILD ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At present our activities are focused on Nepal, we work on physical build projects and where appropriate, ongoing practical support for those projects, education programs around health, welfare and anti human trafficking awareness. Our funding comes from Volunteers who will be on the build projects, donations from outside organisations and funding campaigns to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
- Nepal
Governance
- 16 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Redman-Davies | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
HARRIE DOBBY | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tommy Giovannelli | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rayner Thakrar | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shirin Fenn | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.57k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.59k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN NEPAL, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, ITEMS AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Hilltop Road
Berkhamsted
HP4 2JU
- Phone:
- 07528414667
- Email:
- therebuildcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window