THE TONI AND TOSIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1194721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS PEOPLE WHO ARE DEAF OR WHO HAVE A HEARING IMPAIRMENT BY HELPING TO REMOVE BARRIERS; PROMOTING INCLUSION; CREATING OPPORTUNITIES AND PROVIDING EDUCATION, COMMUNICATION AIDS, SPECIALIST SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £4,833
Total expenditure: £5,389

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OYINKANSOLA KALEJAIYE Chair 08 June 2021
None on record
AYODELE ALOFE Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
MOGBONJUBOLA LASISI Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
SELIAT OLORUNKEMI ABARI Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
PROF FOLUWASAYO EMMANUEL OLOGE Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £7.18k £9.18k £4.83k
Total expenditure £1.61k £10.72k £5.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 13 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 13 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 13 June 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 13 June 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 MAYFIELD CLOSE
HARPENDEN
AL5 3LG
Phone:
07949732979
Website:

No information available