TRINITY SAFE SPACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trinity Safe Space provides many services: -two, weekly drop-ins; English for Speakers of Other Languages sessions; social gatherings; celebration events; access to interpretation; help, information and support to asylum seekers, refugees and vulnerable migrants; signposting to other organisations, and we have given out food, essential items eg clothes, shoes, household goods, furniture, bikes etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,824 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Halton
Governance
- 24 June 2021: CIO registration
- 14 March 2022: Funds received from 240825 MRS ELIZABETH HATTON WOOD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Mary Ruth | Chair | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Thomas McCann | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Godwin | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Gillian Margaret Younger | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
YVONNE HEDGECOCK | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Mark Harwood | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Gillian Beswick | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Scott | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.78k | £145.17k | £33.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.75k | £107.17k | £59.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £113.86k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.71k | £17.33k | £22.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM, THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, AND WHO RESIDE IN HALTON, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE, UTILISING THE EXPERTISE OF PARTNER ORGANISATIONS AND THE PROVISION OF MATERIAL SUPPORT WHERE NECESSARY; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM, THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN AND BE ASSIMILATED INTO A NEW COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH FOR SPEAKERS OF OTHER LANGUAGES (ESOL), CULTURAL AWARENESS, INFORMATION ON SCHOOL/COLLEGE/UNIVERSITY ADMISSIONS AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Michael's Catholic Presbytery
off St Michael's Road
Ditton Road
Widnes
Cheshire
WA8 8TF
- Phone:
- 07395 084772
- Email:
- tsshalton@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window