POINTERS IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To find new homes for Pointers that have had a detrimental change in circumstances here in the UK. 2. To achieve new lives and re-home ex hunting, abused or neglected Pointer dogs from abroad. 3. To enable the treatment, rehabilitation and care of Pointers before they are rehomed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mathew Jefford | Chair | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karin Emma Ringrose | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Phipps | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CEO Claire Stokes | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.34k | £110.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.53k | £99.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: • FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF POINTERS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE REHOMING SERVICES TO SECURE NEW PERMANENT HOMES IN WHICH THE POINTERS CAN THRIVE. • TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS POINTERS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR POINTERS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE OF DOGS IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Sykes & Co Ltd
Suite 5A
Bangor
Gwynedd
LL57 1UR
- Phone:
- 07754945710
- Email:
- info@pointersinneed.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window