RICHMOND & CATTERICK GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing horse and pony riding for disabled people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 March 2021: CIO registration
- 15 September 2021: Funds received from 1074325 RICHMOND AND CATTERICK RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASS...
- RICHMOND & CATTERICK RDA GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIEUTENANT COLONEL DAVID ROBERT SUMMERS | Chair | 22 October 2022 |
|
|||||
ADRIENNE ANNE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Childs | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Warner | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE ROBSON | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Phillips | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.64k | £11.95k | £26.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.19k | £5.42k | £22.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.70k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.70k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE YORKSHIRE AND CLEVELAND AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masham House
Firby
BEDALE
North Yorkshire
DL8 2PW
- Phone:
- 01677425473
- Email:
- drsummers95@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window