OUR MYNACHDY COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity promotes educational activities, provides facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation & other leisure time activities and seeks to prevent or relieve poverty through the vehicle of the Mynachdy community centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 27 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Odeng Charles Namurach | Chair | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Buck | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Buck | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRIS NAMURACH | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iain Randolph Neal Claridge MA BA | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Lynne Robinson | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.95k | £18.65k | £15.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.43k | £25.73k | £27.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF MYNACHDY AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, OR WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mynachdy Community Centre
Mynachdy road
Cardiiff
CF14 3DY
- Phone:
- 07873336987
- Email:
- committee@ourmynachdy.org.uk
- Website:
-
mynachdycommunitycentre.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window