THE @SALLYCANCER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to improve the welfare and fulfill the needs of children with cancer & leukemia. to help, support & assist children & their families during treatment and to make their stay in hospital as enjoyable as possible. to support other charities involved in helping children with cancer & their families. to raise raise awareness of childhood cancer & improve diagnosis times
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
jo jo-anne gibson | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
BERYL GIBSON | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ste stephen gibson | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.41k | £15.17k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £434 | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER & LEUKEMIA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUCH SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING:- TO HELP, SUPPORT & ASSIST CHILDREN & THEIR FAMILIES DURING TREATMENT AND TO MAKE THEIR STAY IN HOSPITAL AS ENJOYABLE AS POSSIBLE; TO PROVIDE FUNDING FOR SPECIALIST TREATMENT AND EQUIPMENT; TO SUPPORT OTHER CHARITIES INVOLVED IN HELPING CHILDREN WITH CANCER & THEIR FAMILIES; TO RAISE AWARENESS OF CHILDHOOD CANCER & SYMPTOMS AND IMPROVE DIAGNOSIS TIMES; AND TO INCREASE AVAILABILITY OF SPECIALIST TREATMENT & EQUIPMENT INCLUDING PROTON BEAM THERAPY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holly Cottage
Washington Lane
Euxton
CHORLEY
Lancashire
PR7 6DJ
- Phone:
- 01257275973
- Website:
-
@sallycancer
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window