DE SILVA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improve education and healthcare including the lives for vulnerable children.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DON JULIAN DE SILVA | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
YAY YEE YEE SEIN | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chaw Su DE SILVA | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Ground Floor 23 HARLEY STREET
LONDON
W1G 9QN
- Phone:
- 014062821117
- Email:
- info@desilvafoundation.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window