WATAN ALKHAIR RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Watan Alkhair Relief is working to alleviate the hardship, poverty and suffering in Yemen. Including women, children, vulnerable people and families by, providing means of saving lives. Providing practical and financial assistance, to partnering organisations in Yemen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Yemen
Governance
- 19 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elham Al-sarori | Chair | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rahmah Ali | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lamyae Hadi | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.44k | £105.72k | £128.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.04k | £104.49k | £107.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE HARDSHIP, POVERTY AND SUFFERING OF VICTIMS OF WAR-TORN YEMEN, INCLUDING WOMEN, CHILDREN, VULNERABLE PEOPLE AND FAMILIES BY: I. PROVIDING MEANS OF SAVING LIVES. II. PROVIDING PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PARTNERING ORGANISATIONS IN YEMEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 FAIRFIELD HILL
LEEDS
LS13 3DJ
- Phone:
- 0113 873 0233
- Email:
- info@watanalkhairrelief.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window