BISHOPS WALTHAM YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,200 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 May 2021: CIO registration
- 15 September 2022: Funds received from 301746 BISHOPS WALTHAM YOUTH HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Belfield | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Jeffcott | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Armstrong | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.54k | £72.06k | £26.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.33k | £26.23k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.67k | £1.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF THE SOCIAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE AND RESIDENTS IN THE PARISH OF BISHOPS WALTHAM AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT AND TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THEIR BENEFIT AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Leopold Drive
Bishops Waltham
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1JU
- Phone:
- 07726285550
- Email:
- robarmsa81@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window