SUPPORT SEND KIDS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity seeks to use technology to provide free, accurate guidance to those interpreting (and advising on) SEND law and other laws that affect SEND families. We provide a platform to publish interpretations of the law and facilitate answers to questions SEND parents have. Enabling SEND families and professionals to self-serve in law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL AMOS | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Franks | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Foges | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Withers | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANVI BALWANT PATEL | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.73k | £32.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.48k | £39.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 December 2023 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 December 2023 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2021 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 APR 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITY IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) COLLECTING INFORMATION AND PRODUCING INSIGHT ABOUT THE RIGHTS OF AND RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS, (2) PROVIDING EASY AND USER-FRIENDLY ACCESS TO SUCH INFORMATION VIA ONLINE PLATFORMS; (3) PROVIDING ONLINE PLATFORMS TO CONNECT SUCH PERSONS WITH OTHER INDIVIDUALS WILLING TO PROVIDE ADVICE, SUPPORT OR ASSISTANCE; AND (4) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE TECHNICAL AND LEGAL ISSUES THAT MAY ARISE WHEN SEEKING SUPPORT AND EDUCATIONAL PROVISION FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Church Gardens
LEEDS
LS17 6DH
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- CONTACT@SUPPORTSENDKIDS.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window