1ST LEVEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Scout, Cub and Beavers Group activities for the young childern in our area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dannielle Robins | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Coulson | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Streets | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Lewis Birch | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dan Richardson | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Richardson | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Birtwistle | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Phillips | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Peak | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.51k | £24.01k | £20.18k | £16.94k | £16.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.54k | £13.14k | £11.73k | £18.58k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £11.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Victoria Croft
Leven
BEVERLEY
HU17 5AB
- Phone:
- 01964503885
- Email:
- leven.scouts@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window